U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2019: [Response]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2019: [Request]
  • December 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.