U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saul
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 23, 2020: [Extend]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.