U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [For Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.