U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Response]
  • November 14, 2019: [Request]
  • November 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 12, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 12, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.