U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • August 27, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 13, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.