U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burning Breast
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Request]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.