U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 15, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2020: [Jury List]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response]
  • September 10, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 08, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Discovery]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Request]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.