U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown Otter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 19, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 27, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Request]
  • November 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.