U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2023: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 04, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 05, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 05, 2020: [Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Furlough]
  • January 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • December 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 13, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Furlough]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request]
  • November 15, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Request]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.