U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 16, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 07, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2020: [Request]
  • February 06, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 04, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2020: [Request]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 31, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.