U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Lance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request]
  • November 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Request]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.