U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seaboy Block
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Request]
  • December 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • December 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2019: [Request]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.