U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larvie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Forfeiture]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Forfeiture]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 23, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order re Exhibits]
  • October 08, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 30, 2020: [Verdict]
  • September 30, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 30, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 29, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 29, 2020: [Jury List]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 28, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 28, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • September 21, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 18, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 18, 2020: [Brief]
  • September 18, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 18, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 17, 2020: [Jury List]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Consent]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 13, 2020: [Witness List]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Request]
  • December 06, 2019: [Discovery]
  • December 06, 2019: [Response]
  • December 06, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Suppress]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request]
  • November 14, 2019: [Request]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.