U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 27, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Request]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Request]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.