U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warnke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 15, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 14, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 14, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 23, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 17, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • November 17, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 10, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 20, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Subpoena(s)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 19, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 18, 2020: [Objection]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Furlough]
  • August 18, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 14, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 13, 2020: [Request]
  • August 13, 2020: [Jury List]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Request]
  • November 20, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.