U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sterud et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 30, 2020: [Furlough]
  • July 29, 2020: [Furlough]
  • July 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 20, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Discovery]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Request]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.