U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walking Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 14, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [In Limine]
  • November 17, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 17, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extend]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 25, 2019: [Request]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request]
  • November 22, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.