U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 06, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 03, 2020: [Request]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 04, 2020: [Bail Report]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 31, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 30, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.