U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Subpoena(s)]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 20, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 17, 2020: [Response]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2020: [Furlough]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • July 29, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 22, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 26, 2019: [Request]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.