U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horne et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 13, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 02, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2021: [Consent]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Number Assigned to Magistrate Appeal]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 17, 2020: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • November 10, 2020: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • November 10, 2020: [Transcript]
  • November 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 06, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 25, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 02, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.