U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gullikson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 13, 2020: [Restitution Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Objection]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.