U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saddler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 04, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 03, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 03, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 21, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • April 10, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 07, 2021: [Request]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 06, 2021: [Expedite ]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 01, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Receipt]
  • February 25, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • February 25, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 28, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 21, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 15, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [For Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2020: [For Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 05, 2020: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • November 05, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 04, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 10, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 03, 2020: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 25, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 25, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 25, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 12, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2020: [Suppress]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 13, 2019: [Response]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • December 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.