U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeffries
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 22, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Declaration]
  • August 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 19, 2020: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • August 19, 2020: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.