U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sweeney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 30, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 14, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2019: [Request]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.