U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 17, 2020: [Forfeiture]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 05, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • December 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 04, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • December 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.