U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10111
  • Case Name: Erik Russell Nolte
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Case Closed Without a Discharge]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments Without Entry of Discharge]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objecting to Discharge (Rule 4004)]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.