U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 06-50022
  • Case Name: Gregg Albert Maynard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Payment of Unclaimed Funds]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Support Document]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Unclaimed Funds Supporting Documentation]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Payment of Unclaimed Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.