U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carlson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 21, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 19, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 19, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 29, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 07, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • July 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 23, 2020: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2020: [Extend]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Request]
  • December 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 10, 2019: [Response]
  • December 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Request]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.