U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40555
  • Case Name: Steven Raymond Weddle and Jacqueline Mae Weddle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.