U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roubideaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extend]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 29, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 11, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 05, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.