U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Block
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 05, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • May 05, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 04, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 29, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 28, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 19, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 13, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Consent]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Request]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.