U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 12, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Request]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 23, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Request]
  • December 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 13, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.