U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grondahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 15, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 01, 2021: [Extend]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 23, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Response]
  • February 10, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Suppress]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Request]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.