U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grey Owl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 25, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 27, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 27, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Request]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.