U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hebb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 27, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 26, 2021: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 26, 2021: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 27, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • December 18, 2019: [Request]
  • December 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Request]
  • December 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.