U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taken Alive et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Request]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 25, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Request]
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2021: [Request]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • February 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 09, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 08, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2020: [Exhibit List]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 04, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 31, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 30, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 29, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 28, 2020: [Request]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.