U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nordvold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.