U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40560
  • Case Name: Cody Alan Schulz and Jody Lea Schulz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Order Request]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.