U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chapman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 11, 2021: [Restitution Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 19, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 15, 2020: [Text Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 23, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 12, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 24, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.