U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Invocation of Rights]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 05, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 20, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 13, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • December 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Jury List]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2020: [Waiver]
  • July 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice]
  • May 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 09, 2020: [Request]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Request]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.