U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50213
  • Case Name: Batchelder Properties, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Motion]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule H]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule G]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule E/F]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule D]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule A/B]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Corrective Entry]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.