U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doherty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 03, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 20, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 02, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 19, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 19, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 29, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • September 01, 2020: [Voir Dire Began]
  • September 01, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 01, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2020: [Objection]
  • August 28, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • August 25, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 25, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 24, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 12, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 04, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Transcript]
  • July 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2020: [Response]
  • July 23, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2020: [Response]
  • July 20, 2020: [Suppress]
  • July 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Suppress]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Request]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2020: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • April 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Text Order for Repayment of CJA Fees]
  • December 13, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Request]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.