U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 02, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 02, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 18, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 17, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 17, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 16, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response]
  • June 08, 2021: [Response]
  • June 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Subpoena Issued]
  • April 29, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Psychiatric Report Received]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 03, 2020: [Leave to]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 17, 2020: [Furlough]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2020: [Competency Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2020: [Request]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Psychiatric Examination]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.