U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 17, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Request]
  • May 24, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 23, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 22, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.