U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:89-cr-30049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arcoren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 09, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 08, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.