U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-04009
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Kiggins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 06, 2021: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (prior Court approval required)]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 13, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 22, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule (Pre)Trial/Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • December 17, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • December 17, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.