U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2019: [Response]
  • December 27, 2019: [Request]
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.