U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Runnels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Consent]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 20, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 20, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Request]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.