U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Elk et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 08, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 02, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2022: [Consent]
  • July 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Request]
  • September 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 18, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 07, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 07, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Request]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.