U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Heels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [Consent]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 15, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.